Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Jameson, Fisher, Jackson, Morgan, O'Donnell, Patterson, Proctor, Rey, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to conduct a study of the availability, accessibility, and affordability of commercial motor vehicle insurance for motor carriers who want to employ entry-level commercial driver's license holders; requiring the Department to make specified recommendations on or before December 1, 2015 to specified committees of the General Assembly; authorizing the Department to consult with specified State agencies, institutions, industries, and other persons; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0910
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM