Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Collection Agencies - Exemptions From Licensure
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the exemption from the requirement that a person must have a license to operate as a collection agency to include all lawyers, and employees under the supervision of a lawyer, who are collecting a debt for a client; repealing the requirement that lawyers who have employees who are nonlawyers primarily engaged in debt collection must have a license to operate as a collection agency; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0068
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Collection Agencies - Exemptions From Licensure
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation - Collection Agencies - Exemptions From Licensure
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-102, 7-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM