Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsored by
Delegate Oaks (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Delegates Anderson and Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering procedures for filing a complaint with the Baltimore City Civilian Review Board; repealing specified time limits on filing a complaint; authorizing a complainant to request that a complaint be confidential; providing that a specified report, under specified circumstances, remains subject to a specified review and specified recommendations by the Board; repealing a specified period of time within which the Board is required to submit a specified statement to the head of a specified law enforcement unit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0829
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {882312/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {882312/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-41, 16-42, 16-43, 16-44, 16-45, 16-46, 16-48 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM