Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Anderson, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Bobo, Bromwell, Cardin, Carr, Carter, Clagett, Costa, Cullison, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Hammen, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lafferty, Lee, Love, Luedtke, Malone, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mitchell, Mizeur, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Stein, Summers, Swain, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting discrimination based on gender identity with regard to public accommodations, housing, and employment and by specified licensed or regulated persons; prohibiting discrimination based on sexual orientation or gender identity with regard to commercial leasing; altering an exception for employers relating to standards concerning dress and grooming; providing specified immunity; requiring State personnel actions to be made without regard to gender identity or sexual orientation; defining the term "gender identity"; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0212
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-101, 20-102, 20-1103, 20-301, 20-302, 20-303, 20-304, 20-401, 20-402, 20-501, 20-602, 20-603, 20-605, 20-606, 20-608, 20-702, 20-704, 20-705, 20-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM