Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup
Sponsored by
Delegates Hubbard, Costa, Cullison, Kach, Nathan-Pulliam, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to convene a stakeholder workgroup to examine specified outpatient services programs, develop a specified proposal, and evaluate a specified standard; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to recommend specified draft legislation; requiring the Secretary to submit a specified report to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before November 1, 2014; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0882
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {626782/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {607870/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {626782/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 48
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {607870/2 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM