Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Hydraulic Fracturing Moratorium and Right to Know Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Delegates Mizeur, Holmes, Bobo, Cardin, Carr, Frick, Frush, Guzzone, Healey, Hixson, Hubbard, Hucker, Lee, Love, Luedtke, A. Miller, Morhaim, Murphy, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Stein, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of the Environment from issuing a permit for the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of natural gas until specified conditions are met; requiring the Department of the Environment and the Department of Natural Resources to issue a specified risk assessment at the same time a specified report is issued; authorizing the Department of the Environment to establish and collect a specified fee under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-102, 14-107.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM