Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Barron, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Opioid Restitution Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund which consists of all revenue received by the State from any source resulting, directly or indirectly, from any judgement against or settlement with, opioid manufacturers, opioid research associations or any other person related to the opioid industry; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund, and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; requiring interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Opioid Restitution Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954766/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Opioid Restitution Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Opioid Restitution Fund
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Opioid Restitution Fund
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {954766/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Opioid Restitution Fund
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Text - Chapter - Opioid Restitution Fund
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page