Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Justice Information Advisory Board - Members
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Public Safety and Correctional Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Criminal Justice Information Advisory Board to include the director or chair of a criminology studies program at a university or college in the State.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (135-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (135-0) 42
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 42
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 59
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM