Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 7/9/2020 4:17:14 AM
Thursday, July 9, 2020
Senate
Created: 6/19/2020 8:00 AM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
The Department of Legislative Services Update on FY 2021 Budget and Briefing by the Department of Budget and Management
(Added - 6/26/2020 12:00 PM)
The Department of Legislative Services Update on FY 2021 Budget
(Removed - 6/26/2020 12:00 PM)

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Joint Committee on Unemployment Insurance Oversight
Created: 7/1/2020 11:42 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
1. The Department's response in times of crisis and its goals, program changes, and recommendations for adapting the unemployment insurance system for future crises; and
2. The status of the Unemployment Insurance Trust Fund (UITF), the need for a loan from the U.S. Department of Labor to replenish UITF, the anticipated change in employer tax contributions in 2021, and any prospective actions the State can take to protect UITF moving forward.

Student Data Privacy Council
Created: 7/7/2020 10:36 AM
9:00 AM to 11:00 AM - Conference Call
Monthly Meeting
To join by phone: 1-855-797-9480 (Toll Free)
Access Code: 161 548 0220