Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the purposes of the Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program; establishing the Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Fund in the Department of Commerce to finance the provision of rental assistance to business entitles located in RISE zones; prohibiting the Secretary of Commerce from approving a Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise (RISE) zone exceeding 500 acres; altering eligibility for tax incentives that a business entity that locates in a RISE zone may receive; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0778
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021, July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {655461/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-4)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {655461/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-4) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 10:29 AM
Click to return on the top page