Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Defining the term vocational certificate to include completion of a course of study that prepares an individual to work in a career field by taking credit-bearing courses or noncredit courses for purposes of establishing eligibility of foster care recipients for specified tuition waivers; and altering a specified requirement that specified foster care recipients and specified unaccompanied homeless youth apply for specified financial aid by a specified time.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484965/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274534/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (President) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {484965/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {274534/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Special Order until later today (President) Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 61A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 66A
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM