Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/27/2020 6:00:28 PM
Monday, January 27, 2020
Senate
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Created: 1/27/2020 11:21 AM
Executive Nominations Committee - Appearing Live!
5:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
University of Maryland Medical System Board of Directors
Elisa M. Basnight, Esq., Prince George's County, District 23
Kathleen A. Birrane, Esq., Baltimore County, District 42
Brianna D. Bowling, Charles County, District 28
R. Alan Butler, Harford County, District 34
Joseph A. Ciotola, Jr., Queen Anne's County, District 36
James C. DiPaula, Jr., Anne Arundel County, District 33
Wanda Q. Draper, Baltimore County, District 10
Jason S. Frankl, Esq., Anne Arundel County, District 33
James M. Harkins, Harford County, District 35
Joyce M. Johnson, D.O., Montgomery County, District 18
Keith McMahan, Caroline County, District 36
Keary M. Nance, Prince George's County, District 24
Louis M. Pope, Howard County, District 9
R. Kent Schwab, Talbot County, District 37
Thomas E. Scott, Anne Arundel County, District 33
Joseph T.N. Suarez, Montgomery County, District 18
Elizabeth E. Sweeney, Baltimore County, District 15
Alexander Williams, Jr., Prince George's County, District 23
John T. Williams, Baltimore City, District 46

Created: 1/27/2020 11:26 AM
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appearing Live!
5:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Howard County Board of Elections
Timothy J. Mummert, Esq., Howard County, District 13

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Restore Trust in Policing, Commission to
Created: 10/23/2019 10:59 AM
9:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Please see the Commission webpage for the agenda and meeting updates

School-Based Health Centers, Maryland Council on
Created: 1/2/2020 2:50 PM
1:00 PM - 170 House Office Building, 6 Bladen Street, Annapolis, MD 21401
Meeting of the Maryland Council on School Based Health Centers.