Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Workgroup on the Provision and Coverage of Behavioral Health Crisis Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Angel, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Morales, Platt, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to convene a workgroup that includes specified individuals and interested stakeholders to identify barriers to the provision of behavioral health crisis services and coverage of the services by health insurance carriers; requiring the Administration to report the findings and recommendations of the workgroup to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Administration - Workgroup on the Provision and Coverage of Behavioral Health Crisis Services
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM