Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings
Sponsored by
Delegates Zucker, Arora, Barkley, Bobo, Braveboy, Burns, Clagett, Feldman, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hucker, Jameson, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lee, Love, Luedtke, McHale, Minnick, Olszewski, Schuh, Schulz, Vaughn, Walker, Rudolph, Wilson, and Frick
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Resources to request a security freeze on the consumer report or a specified record of specified protected consumers who are minor children in the custody of a local department of social services who have been placed in a foster care setting in accordance with specified application procedures; requiring a consumer reporting agency to place a security freeze for a protected consumer under specified circumstances and within a specified period of time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0897
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243396/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {377777/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Senators Klausmeier, Kittleman, and Garagiola
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Delegates Jameson, Haddaway-Riccio, and Schulz
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Favorable with Amendments {243396/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Finance 50
Senate 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {377777/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 House Requests Senate Recede 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Senate Refuses to Recede 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Senators Klausmeier, Kittleman, and Garagiola 66
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Delegates Jameson, Haddaway-Riccio, and Schulz 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1212.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM