Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Rate and Subtraction Modification - Parental Leave for Employees
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Harper, Barkley, Barve, Branch, George, Glenn, Ivey, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Stukes, F. Turner, A. Washington, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the rate under the State income tax for specified individuals by .25% under specified circumstances; providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax and corporate income tax for taxpayers who provide specified paid parental leave for specified eligible employees; providing for the calculation of the subtraction modification; requiring a taxpayer to file a specified statement with the taxpayer's return in order to qualify for the subtraction modification; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-207, 10-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM