Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions - Statute of Limitations on Claims
Sponsored by
Delegates Jameson, Clagett, Haddaway-Riccio, Love, Minnick, and Schulz
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the date by which a medical expert is required to conduct a specified study and report the findings of the study to the Department of Legislative Services; delaying the date by which a claim filed for an occupational disease may be based on alterations to a specified presumption; delaying the date by which alterations to a specified presumption may be construed to apply for a claim filed for an occupational disease; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0681
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-503, 9-711 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM