Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that funds in a specified account be transferred on the death of a party to the account to the deceased party's estate; requiring that agreements for specified accounts opened on or after October 1, 2016, contain specified provisions; requiring a depository institution, for specified accounts, to give the account party or parties a specified form; requiring that specified materials be given to a party or parties before a depository institution establishes a specified type of account or modifies a specified account; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0772
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM