Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Construction - Creative Financing Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Olszewski, Ivey, Arora, Aumann, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Boteler, Braveboy, Bromwell, Burns, Cardin, Carr, Cluster, Cullison, Davis, DeBoy, Frank, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Impallaria, Kach, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lee, Luedtke, McDonough, A. Miller, Minnick, Mizeur, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Reznik, S. Robinson, Simmons, Stein, Summers, Swain, Szeliga, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, Weir, Zucker, Jones, Griffith, Eckardt, Sophocleus, Conway, Gaines, Haynes, James, and Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to conduct a specified study and make specified recommendations regarding the development of specified alternative financing methods; requiring the Committee to solicit input from specified entities; requiring the Committee to submit an interim report on or before December 1, 2014, and a final report on or before September 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0927
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {374469/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {959335/1
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {959335/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) {393625/1
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator DeGrange) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) {393625/1 Rejected
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {623027/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {374469/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/07/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable with Amendments {959335/1 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable with Amendments {959335/1 Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) {393625/1 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator DeGrange) Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) {393625/1 Rejected 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {623027/1 Withdrawn 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM