Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission – Executive Director – Clarification
Sponsored by
Delegate Proctor
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Executive Director of the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission to be a sworn police office with certain powers; specifying that the Executive Director is a member of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System as a condition of employment; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to transfer certain service earned under certain circumstances; and requiring the Board of Trustees to transfer certain contributions.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0761
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission – Executive Director – Clarification
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 9:36 AM
Click to return on the top page