Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Hammen, Barve, Bromwell, Cluster, Frank, Frick, Griffith, Healey, Hubbard, Impallaria, Kach, A. Kelly, McComas, McIntosh, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Oaks, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Stein, Szeliga, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a system for adjudication of a claim involving a birth-related neurological injury; excluding specified rights and remedies of a claimant and specified other persons; providing for specified procedures; providing for specified benefits and compensation of a claimant under the Act; establishing the Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund; providing for specified premiums and insurance surcharges to be used to finance and administer the Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0798
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Hearing cancelled (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/07/2014 Text - First - Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2D-01 through 3-2D-08 )
(   20-1401 through 20-1403 )
(   32-101 through 32-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM