Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Fraser-Hidalgo, Adams, Angel, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Bromwell, Brooks, Carey, Carr, Carter, Chang, Cluster, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Frick, Frush, Gilchrist, Glass, Gutierrez, Hammen, Hayes, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Jackson, Jalisi, Kaiser, Kelly, Kipke, Kittleman, Knotts, Korman, Krebs, Krimm, Lam, Lisanti, Luedtke, McComas, McCray, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, A. Miller, W. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Parrott, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Simonaire, Smith, Stein, Szeliga, Tarlau, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, B. Wilson, C. Wilson, P. Young, Anderson, Conaway, Malone, Proctor, Queen, Rey, Sydnor, and Vallario
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to require a person who is convicted of specified offenses relating to driving under the influence, a person who refuses a breath alcohol concentration test, or a person who is found to have a blood alcohol concentration level of at least 0.08 but less than 0.15 from a breath alcohol concentration test to participate in the Ignition Interlock System Program for a specified period; requiring a court to order a person to participate in the Program under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0945
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {332410/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Special Order until 03/09 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Special Order until 03/11 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {162419/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {618975/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {332410/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Special Order until 03/09 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 40
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Special Order until 03/11 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 43
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Floor Committee Amendment {162419/1 Adopted 43
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 45
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {618975/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 63A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-205, 16-205.1, 16-404.1, 27-107.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM