Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Advertisements - Paid for by Maryland Taxpayers
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Afzali, Bates, Boteler, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Glass, Jacobs, Kipke, McDermott, McMillan, Myers, Schuh, Schulz, Serafini, Stocksdale, Szeliga, and Vitale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that any advertisement that is paid for by the State and issued by or on behalf of specified courts, the Maryland General Assembly, or specified departments and units of the Executive Branch of State government include the statement, "This message has been paid for by the taxpayers of Maryland"; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1805, 8-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM