Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Students With Sickle Cell Disease - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Patterson, Acevero, D. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Bridges, Charles, Crosby, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, Ebersole, Fennell, W. Fisher, Gaines, Glenn, Healey, Hill, Jalisi, Kaiser, Lehman, McComas, McKay, Mosby, Proctor, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Sydnor, Turner, Valentino-Smith, Walker, Washington, R. Watson, Wilkins, and Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 542
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending to August 1, 2019, the date by which the Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health are required to develop guidelines for public schools regarding health care services to students with sickle cell disease; extending the date to September 1, 2019, for the departments to provide certain technical assistance to schools and develop a process to monitor implementation of guidelines for public schools regarding the administration of health care services to students with sickle cell disease; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Students With Sickle Cell Disease - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {765164/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Students With Sickle Cell Disease - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 542
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Students With Sickle Cell Disease - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Public Schools - Students With Sickle Cell Disease - Revisions
House 2/22/2019 2/25/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {765164/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Students With Sickle Cell Disease - Revisions
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 542
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Students With Sickle Cell Disease - Revisions
(   7-444 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page