Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas
Sponsored by
Delegates Rose, Adams, Anderton, Beitzel, Bromwell, Buckel, Chang, Cluster, Folden, Grammer, Hayes, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, McComas, McKay, W. Miller, Morgan, Otto, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a local jurisdiction to authorize a residential major subdivision served by on-site sewage disposal systems, community sewerage systems, or shared systems in Tier III and Tier IV areas under specified circumstances; exempting specified residential major subdivisions from specified provisions of law; and specifying that the Act does not create new development rights.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
(   9-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page