Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Barron, Ali, Branch, Brooks, Conaway, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Korman, R. Lewis, McIntosh, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Queen, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Sydnor, Tarlau, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the Act applies only to an action brought by a unit of State or local government or by an owner of a residential building against a specified manufacturer of lead pigment for specified damages allegedly caused by the presence of lead-based paint in a residential building; providing that the Act does not apply to specified actions for specified damages arising from personal injury or death or to specified actions against a person other than a manufacturer; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0542
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Text - First - Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery Act
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2101 through 3-2107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM