Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community Trust
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Sanchez, Pena-Melnyk, Gutierrez, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Brooks, Carr, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Mosby, Oaks, Patterson, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, P. Young, and Ali
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that an official of State government or a local government is immune from criminal and civil liability for refusing to provide information to the federal government or another state that will be used for specified purposes; stating it is the intent of the General Assembly to maintain community trust in Maryland governmental operations and law enforcement by clarifying the parameters of State and local participation in federal immigration enforcement efforts; requiring the Attorney General to develop specified policies; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0835
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0029 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Law Enforcement and Governmental Trust Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {282717/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {383428/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-82)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community Trust
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (83-55)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Law Enforcement and Governmental Trust Act
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {282717/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Floor Amendment {383428/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-82) 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community Trust
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted 51
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (83-55) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM