Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Securities - Maryland Small Business Funding Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Schuh, Barve, and Costa
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Synopsis
Exempting a specified security issued to a resident of the State by a specified business entity from specified registration and filing requirements under specified circumstances; exempting a specified Web site that is used to facilitate the sale of a specified security from specified registration and filing requirements under specified circumstances; requiring the Division of Securities within the Office of the Attorney General to inspect and review specified Web sites under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-205, 11-401, 11-501, 11-901 through 11-907 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM