Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Atterbeary, D. Barnes, Bromwell, Cassilly, Cullison, Frush, Hayes, Miele, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Walker, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to adopt regulations that require, subject to specified exceptions, a large family child care home to use specified green product cleaning supplies, establish guidelines for purchasing specified green product cleaning supplies, establish specified green cleaning practices, and require specified staff training; requiring the State Superintendent of Education to adopt regulations that require a child care center to use, subject to specified exceptions, specified green product cleaning supplies; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
(   5-551, 5-573 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page