Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Death Certificates - Completion and Cause of Death Report
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a physician designated by the State Anatomy Board to complete a certificate of death under certain circumstances; requiring a certain physician to enter certain information in a certain section of a death certificate; and requiring the State Anatomy Board to send to the Secretary of Health a report of the cause of death for entry on a certain death certificate if the State Anatomy Board receives information about the cause of death from certain individuals.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1012
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Public Health - Death Certificates - Completion and Cause of Death Report
House 3/11/2019 3/12/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Public Health - Death Certificates - Completion and Cause of Death Report
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Finance 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted 51
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Death Certificates - Completion and Cause of Death Report
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM