Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Real Estate Sales Contracts - Required Notice
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel and Hayes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a contract for the sale of a single-family dwelling to include a specified notice; requiring a real estate broker, an associate real estate broker, or a real estate salesperson involved in the sale of a single-family dwelling to orally inform the buyer of a specified right; applying the Act to contracts for the sale of a single-family dwelling entered into on or after October 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM