Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Former Officials and Employees - Employment
Sponsored by
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that specified former officials or employees of the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene may not be considered to have participated significantly in a contract under specified circumstances for purposes of specified restrictions on employment; requiring the Department to submit a specified report; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {660113/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {660113/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 60
Senate 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM