Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health And Mental Hygiene, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164 /CH0084
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Regulatory Authority - Permit and Licensing Renewals and Building Plan Reviews
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429 /CH0418
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Former Officials and Employees - Employment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advisory Councils - Renaming and Termination
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 /CH0177
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Prescription Monitoring Data
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0164 /CH0084 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Regulatory Authority - Permit and Licensing Renewals and Building Plan Reviews By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1429 /CH0418 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Former Officials and Employees - Employment By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0079 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advisory Councils - Renaming and Termination By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0080 /CH0177 Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Prescription Monitoring Data By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM