Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Retire in Maryland Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Afzali, Ciliberti, Clark, Folden, Glass, Hornberger, S. Howard, Kittleman, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, W. Miller, Morgan, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Saab, Vogt, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including income from specified retirement plans and unearned income sources within a subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax for specified individuals who are at least 65 years old or who are disabled or whose spouse is disabled; repealing the limitation on the maximum amount allowed as a subtraction modification under the State income tax for specified retirement income; applying the Act to taxable years after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0586 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Retire in Maryland Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Retire in Maryland Act of 2017
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM