Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Definition of Correctional Officer
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Public Safety and Correctional Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "correctional officer" to exclude the classification of correctional officer I for the purposes of the State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 44
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/20/2014 3/20/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM