Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and Treatment
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn and W. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a provider to submit to an employer or an employer's insurer, within a specified period of time, a specified bill for specified medical services or treatment to a covered employee under a under a specified provision of law; and prohibiting the employer or the employer's insurer from being required to pay a bill submitted after a specified period of time except under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0194
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513793/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-37)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and Treatment
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {513793/1 Adopted 43
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and Treatment
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Third Reading Passed (104-37) 45
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Finance 44
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Text - Chapter - Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and Treatment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM