Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Communications Tax Reform Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Harper, and Stukes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the public service company franchise tax on the gross receipts of telephone companies; repealing the boxing and wrestling tax on specified telecasts; imposing the sales and use tax on specified communications services; establishing the sales and use tax rate for specified communications services; requiring that the revenue from the sales and use tax on communications services be distributed to the Rural Broadband Assistance Fund and the General Fund of the State in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/25/2014 Text - First - Communications Tax Reform Act of 2014
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1101, 5-1102 )
(   11-101, 11-104, 11-210, 2-1302.1, 6-101, 6-104, 8-401, 8-402, 8-403, 8-406, 8-407, 8-409 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM