Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel – Employee Mentoring Leave
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Angel, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Sanchez, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Entitling State employees to receive up to 40 hours per year of mentoring leave to mentor at-risk youth in certain approved organizations; requiring employees to match certain compensated time for mentoring with personal leave; requiring certain employees to assist with academic tutoring at public schools or nonprofit organizations or to engage in site or community-based mentoring; requiring the Department of Budget and Management to approve certain organizations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0727
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Personnel – Employee Mentoring Leave
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel – Employee Mentoring Leave
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM