Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Commerce – Employment in the State’s Defense Industry – Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti, Carey, Chang, Dumais, Jalisi, Jameson, Wilson, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 795
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, subject to the receipt of certain funding, the Department of Commerce, in conjunction with the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, to conduct a study on employment in the State's defense industry; specifying the minimum requirements of the study; requiring the Department of Commerce to consult with certain entities; requiring the Department of Commerce to report, on or before June 30, 2019, to the General Assembly on the findings of the study; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {623892/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {317372/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 795
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Commerce - Employment in the State's Defense Industry - Army Alliance Study
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {623892/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Department of Commerce – Employment in the State’s Defense Industry – Study
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48A
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {317372/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Department of Commerce – Employment in the State’s Defense Industry – Study
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 795
Text - Chapter - Department of Commerce – Employment in the State’s Defense Industry – Study
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM