Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Delegates Anderson, Atterbeary, Clippinger, Davis, Dumais, Frick, Waldstreicher, and Wilson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the maximum civil penalty that may be assessed against a person for a violation of the Maryland Antitrust Act from $100,000 to $10,000; and providing that each day a violation of the Act continues is a separate violation.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0891
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate West) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate West) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-43)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Adopted 42
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate West) Adopted 42
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate West) Adopted 44
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (93-43) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48A
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM