Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hunting Licenses - Exemption for Retired Members of the Armed Forces
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell, Beidle, Cane, Holmes, Jacobs, Norman, Otto, Vitale, Weir, and Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating an exemption for a person who is a retired former member of the armed forces of the United States from the requirement to obtain a hunting license under specified circumstances; providing that the exemption applies only to hunting on specified farmland that is under specified ownership; and requiring a person who hunts under the exemption to possess a retired-military identification card, written permission to hunt during a specified time period from the property owner, and any required hunting stamps.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted (129-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted (128-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Referred Environmental Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {780812/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted (129-0) 43
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted (128-0) 43
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Referred Environmental Matters 43
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {780812/2 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM