Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 7/8/2020 6:41:43 PM
Wednesday, July 8, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 7/6/2020 12:48 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
4:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Update from the Department of Legislative Services and the Department of Budget and Management on the State budget

Other
Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup
Created: 7/7/2020 1:23 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting

Reconciliation and Equity, Morgan State University's Task Force on
Created: 6/29/2020 3:49 PM
6:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
To view click here
Password: 972661
Presentation of preliminary racial disparities data from the Institute for Urban Research and to discuss action items needed from the task force members.