Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Drug Overdose Prevention Programs - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to deny, suspend, revoke, or refuse to renew the registration of a person who manufactures, distributes, or dispenses a controlled dangerous substance in the State under specified conditions; requiring a local drug overdose fatality review team to review specified information and records related to a specified individual; providing the Overdose Response Program to authorize specified individuals to administer an opioid antagonist under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Drug Overdose Prevention Programs - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Public Health - Drug Overdose Prevention Programs - Revisions
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-307 )
(   13-3101 through 13-3103, 13-3104 through 13-3106, 13-3107 through 13-3111, 5-901, 5-903 through 5-905 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM