Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 /CH0103
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145 /CH0109
Title
Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Nonlicensed Persons - Provisional Licensure
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747 /CH0139
Title
Public Health - Cigarette Restitution Fund Programs - Modifications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1432 /CH0570
Title
Health Care Providers - Prescription Opioids - Limits on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1549
Title
Public Health - Drug Overdose Prevention Programs - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 /CH0040
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and Councils
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 /CH0669
Title
State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0127 /CH0103 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0145 /CH0109 Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Nonlicensed Persons - Provisional Licensure By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0747 /CH0139 Public Health - Cigarette Restitution Fund Programs - Modifications By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1432 /CH0570 Health Care Providers - Prescription Opioids - Limits on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017) By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1549 Public Health - Drug Overdose Prevention Programs - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0038 /CH0040 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Updating Advisory Boards and Councils By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0041 /CH0669 State Board of Nursing - Nurse Licensure Compact - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2017 - 3:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM