Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 115-16
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to establish a Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program to provide loans to residential customers to finance the replacement of malfunctioning polybutylene pipes on customer property located in the Commission's service territory that connect from service connections to customer residences; requiring the Program to provide for loan terms and conditions, including an interest rate that may not exceed the prime rate applicable on the day the loan is made; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0910 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {300818/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {147979/1
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/25/2016 2/26/2016 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {300818/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Finance 48A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {147979/1 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton) 63
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM