Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the fee from $25 to $125 for a county license to sell cigarettes at retail in Charles County; requiring the Clerk of the Circuit Court for Charles County to distribute $25 of each license fee to the Comptroller and to distribute $100 of each license fee to Charles County to be used to enforce existing laws banning the sale or distribution of tobacco or tobacco products to minors; and prohibiting the use of certain funds to supplant certain existing funding for a certain purpose.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1266
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
House 3/09/2018 3/12/2018 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-101, 16-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM