Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Deputy Secretary for Operations and Director of the Behavioral Health Administration - Repeal of Positions
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the position of Deputy Secretary for Operations in the Maryland Department of Health; repealing the position of Director of the Behavioral Health Administration in the Maryland Department of Health; requiring the Deputy Secretary for Behavioral Health to perform the duties assigned to the former Director of the Behavioral Health Administration; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Deputy Secretary for Operations and Director of the Behavioral Health Administration - Repeal of Positions
House 3/30/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-1202, 10-1203, 10-308, 10-312, 10-401, 10-407, 10-408, 10-420, 10-423, 10-701, 10-711, 10-802, 10-807, 10-808, 10-812, 10-903, 10-921, 10-923, 10-924, 10-925, 2-103, 4-307, 5-703, 5-808, 7.5-101, 7.5-202 through 7.5-204, 7.5-303, 8-101, 8-502.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM