Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
United States Constitution - Democracy Amendment
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Anderson, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barve, Bromwell, Carr, Chang, Cluster, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gaines, Gutierrez, Hammen, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Patterson, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Tarlau, Turner, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Urging the U.S. Congress to propose an amendment to the U.S. Constitution that affirms every citizen's individual right to vote, reserves inalienable political rights to natural persons, and authorizes regulation of campaign contributions and electioneering expenditures.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SJ0002
Introduced in a prior session as: HJ0007 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983426/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-50)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments {983426/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (89-50) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM