Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Barve, Busch, Davis, Frick, Jones, Kaiser, McIntosh, Pendergrass, and Vallario
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Directing the Attorney General to take specified actions regarding civil and criminal suits and actions that are based on the federal government's action or inaction that threatens the public interest and welfare of the residents of the State; requiring the Attorney General, except under specified circumstances, to provide the Governor with specified notice and an opportunity to review and comment on specified suits and actions before commencing specified suits and actions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SJ0005
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Delegate Healey) Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {443826/1 (Delegate Flanagan)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Morgan) Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (50-88)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-50)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
25
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Hearing 2/10 at 11:30 a.m.
Text - First - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Adopted 24
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Delegate Healey) Adopted 24
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Floor Amendment {443826/1 (Delegate Flanagan) 25
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Morgan) Adopted 25
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Floor Amendment (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (50-88) 25
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (89-50) 26
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 25
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM