Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsored by
Delegates Braveboy, Bobo, Branch, Bromwell, Burns, Cane, Carr, Carter, Clagett, Conway, Cullison, Donoghue, Eckardt, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gaines, Glenn, Griffith, Gutierrez, Howard, Hucker, Impallaria, Ivey, Jones, A. Kelly, Lafferty, Lee, Love, McComas, McIntosh, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Oaks, Otto, Pena-Melnyk, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Stukes, Swain, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilson, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Urging the United States Congress to support efforts to reinstate the separation of commercial and investment banking functions in effect under the Glass-Steagall Act and to support H.R. 129.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SJ0008
Introduced in a prior session as: HJ0003 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM