Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
The Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Busch, Ali, Barkley, Barve, Brooks, Carr, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, Kelly, Kramer, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Stein, Sydnor, Turner, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, P. Young, Branch, Bromwell, Gaines, Healey, C. Howard, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, and Walker
Status
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 5
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expressing the sharp disagreement of the General Assembly of Maryland with the repeal of the Affordable Care Act; urging the U.S. Congress to promptly protect provisions of the federal Affordable Care Act that ensure all Marylanders have access to affordable health insurance coverage, free from discriminatory rates and policies; and urging the Governor of Maryland to join in urging the U.S. Congress to promptly protect specified provisions of the federal Affordable Care Act.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - The Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {953620/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {533222/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (50-90)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - The Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-50)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 5
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - The Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - The Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Favorable with Amendments {953620/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Floor Amendment {533222/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (50-90) 46
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - The Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (90-50) 47
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 5
Text - Chapter - The Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM